COMMUNITY PHARMACIES OF INDIANA, INC. et al v. INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al

Plaintiff: WILLIAMS BROTHERS HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC. and COMMUNITY PHARMACIES OF INDIANA, INC.
Defendant: INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, DAVID TESTERMAN, THE OFFICE OF MEDICAID POLICY AND PLANNING, MICHAEL A. GARGANO and PATRICIA CASANOVA
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00893
Filed: July 1, 2011
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY on Temporary Restraining Order - Plaintiffs' Motion for a TRO (Dkt. 12 ) is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to meet with Magistrate Judge LaRue in room 243 on Tuesday, July 12, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. to determine a briefing schedule. A preliminary injunction hearing shall be held on Wednesday, August 24, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 344, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/8/2011.(TRG)
July 22, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 25 Motion for Clarification or Alternatively to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order - The TRO shall remain in full force and effect until after the Court rules on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction following the August 24, 2011 hearing on the preliminary injunction. The TRO shall remain in effect without the posting of bond until the hearing date of August 24, 2011. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/22/2011. (TRG)
September 14, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - The Court must reverse its decision on the TRO and DENY Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 12 ). Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 12) is DENIED. The State is free to implement and enforce the Fee Reduction. **SEE ENTRY**. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/14/2011. (JD)
October 7, 2011 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - The Court must DENY Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Stay/Injunction Pending Appeal (Dkt. 63 ) with respect to the Fee Reduction itself. However, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' request that the State be enjoined during the pendency o f the appeal from seeking damages, including the recoupment of the difference in rates during the time the temporary restraining order was in effect. Plaintiffs raised this argument in their opening brief, and the State failed to respond, thus waiving the issue. With respect to the Fee Reduction, Plaintiffs may renew their request for a stay in the Seventh Circuit Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/7/2011. (JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: COMMUNITY PHARMACIES OF INDIANA, INC. et al v. INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAMS BROTHERS HEALTH CARE PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: Mark W. Bina
Represented By: Randall R. Fearnow
Represented By: Debra Ann Mastrian
Represented By: Scott Stuart Morrisson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY PHARMACIES OF INDIANA, INC.
Represented By: Mark W. Bina
Represented By: Randall R. Fearnow
Represented By: Debra Ann Mastrian
Represented By: Scott Stuart Morrisson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA FAMILY AND SOCIAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Matthew C. Branic
Represented By: Wade Dunlap Fulford
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Harmony A. Mappes
Represented By: Kate E. Shelby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID TESTERMAN
Represented By: Matthew C. Branic
Represented By: Wade Dunlap Fulford
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Harmony A. Mappes
Represented By: Kate E. Shelby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OFFICE OF MEDICAID POLICY AND PLANNING
Represented By: Matthew C. Branic
Represented By: Wade Dunlap Fulford
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Harmony A. Mappes
Represented By: Kate E. Shelby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL A. GARGANO
Represented By: Matthew C. Branic
Represented By: Wade Dunlap Fulford
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Harmony A. Mappes
Represented By: Kate E. Shelby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA CASANOVA
Represented By: Harmony A. Mappes
Represented By: Ryan Michael Hurley
Represented By: Wade Dunlap Fulford
Represented By: Matthew C. Branic
Represented By: Kate E. Shelby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]