CITIZENS FOR APPROPRIATE RURAL ROADS, INC. et al v. LAHOOD et al

Plaintiff: ANN M. BAAS, LYNNE BERGH, JANICE ANN BOYD, WILLIAM A. BOYD, DARRELL BREEDEN, CITIZENS FOR APPROPRIATE RURAL ROADS, INC., RUTH ANN FLYNN, WILLIAM SCOTT FLYNN, JERRY JOCHIM, KENDA JOCHIM, THOMAS JOCHIM, ANDREW JOHN KNOTT, MICHAEL KNOTT, CHARLOTTE ANN PAUL, H. WAYNE SULLIVAN, THE I-69 ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, SANDRA TOKARSKI, THOMAS TOKARSKI and CORA E. YOUNG
Defendant: MICHAEL B. CLINE, RAY LAHOOD, VICTOR MENDEZ and ROBERT F. TALLY
Case Number: 1:2011cv01031
Filed: August 1, 2011
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2012 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 36 WITHOUT PREJUDICE and DENIES AS MOOT Federal Defendants' Motion to Strike and Motion in Limine 59 . The Court also GRANTS Federal Defendants� 39; Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint 62 WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, Counts III, IV, V, VI, and VIII of the Amended Complaint are dismissed with prejudice and may not be refiled in a subsequent pleading. (S.O.). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 9/19/2012. (MAC)
October 25, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 136 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(b). *** SEE ORDER ***. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 10/25/2013. (CKM)
March 31, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants' motions for summary judgment [Dkt. 160 and 162 ] are GRANTED on all remaining counts of the Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' partial motion for summary judgment and Plaintiffs' second motion for preliminary injunction [Dkt. 141 and 142 ] are accordingly DENIED. The Court will enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/31/2014. (JD)
April 4, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON DEFENDANT INDOT'S 151 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 4/4/2014. (JD)
February 10, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/10/2012. (PGS)
February 10, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court The motions to quash (Dkts. 67, 69, 75, 81, 83, 85, 91) are therefore GRANTED. The magistrate judge will assist the parties to develop a discovery plan that is appropriately targeted to the relevant issues for a preliminary injunction hearing and tha t can be conducted in a timely fashion. The court sets this matter for a telephone conference on February 14, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. (Eastern). Counsel for all parties, including counsel for employees of BLA and Dawn M. Replogle, are to participate in this conference. The court will contact counsel by separate email with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 2/10/2012. (LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CITIZENS FOR APPROPRIATE RURAL ROADS, INC. et al v. LAHOOD et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN M. BAAS
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNNE BERGH
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE ANN BOYD
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. BOYD
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRELL BREEDEN
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR APPROPRIATE RURAL ROADS, INC.
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH ANN FLYNN
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM SCOTT FLYNN
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY JOCHIM
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDA JOCHIM
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS JOCHIM
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW JOHN KNOTT
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL KNOTT
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE ANN PAUL
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. WAYNE SULLIVAN
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE I-69 ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA TOKARSKI
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS TOKARSKI
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORA E. YOUNG
Represented By: Mick G. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B. CLINE
Represented By: William G. Malley
Represented By: Timothy J. Junk
Represented By: Albert M. Ferlo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY LAHOOD
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR MENDEZ
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. TALLY
Represented By: Shelese M. Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]