PANWAR v. ACCESS THERAPIES, INC et al

Defendant: RN STAFF INC, RAMON VILLEGAS and ACCESS THERAPIES, INC
Plaintiff: RITURAJ SINGH PANWAR
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00619
Filed: May 8, 2012
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 68) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED on Counts I, II, VI, and VII, and DENIED on Counts III, IV, and V. Counts I, II, and VI are DISMISSED without prejudice, and Count VII is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/30/2013. (CBU)
March 3, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - granting 97 Motion for Sanctions; granting 122 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 133 Motion to Strike ; Adopting re 155 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees is granted to the extent Defendants shall pay Plaintiff fees and costs amounting to $28,431.46 within 60 days. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/3/2014. Copy Mailed. (CKM)
June 25, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY on Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint - The Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. 168 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/25/2014. (TRG)
January 28, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS - Mr. Panwar's Motion to Dismiss RN Staff's counterclaim for abuse of process (Dkt. 49 ) is GRANTED. RN Staff's Counterclaim (Dkt. 44 ) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/28/2013. (JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PANWAR v. ACCESS THERAPIES, INC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN STAFF INC
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: G. John Cento
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Fecht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMON VILLEGAS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCESS THERAPIES, INC
Represented By: G. John Cento
Represented By: Bryce H. Bennett, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Fecht
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RITURAJ SINGH PANWAR
Represented By: Justin T. Ervin
Represented By: Daniel Kotchen
Represented By: Andrew P. Wirick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]