MOODY v. LAHOOD et al

Defendant: MICHAEL B. CLINE, RAY LAHOOD, JOSEPH MCGUINNESS, VICTOR MENDEZ and ROBERT F. TALLY
Plaintiff: GARY W. MOODY
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00907
Filed: July 2, 2012
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2012 12 Featured Case ENTRY AND NOTICE - The court will apply the foregoing standard to the motion for emergency review. The court's ruling will be entered on the docket and the plaintiff notified as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. And of course, plaintiff may also make reasonable inquiry of the clerk's office from time to time to ascertain whether a ruling has been made. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/5/2012.(JD)
July 6, 2012 13 Featured Case Order (1) Addressing Request to Permit Filing by Fax, (2) Directing Treatment of Documents, (3) Addressing Contact with Court Staff, and (4) Directing Further Proceedings. **SEE ORDER**. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/6/2012. Copy Mailed.(JD)
July 10, 2012 18 Featured Case ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have ten (10) working days from the issuance of this Entry, or until July 24, 2012 in which to supplement his complaint by identifying the administrative decision to which he seeks review und er the APA or, if the matter is presented under § 706(1), by identifying the "agency action unlawfully withheld or unreasonably delayed" and the duty pertaining to such withheld or delayed agency action. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/10/2012. (Copy mailed to Gary Moody)(TRG)
August 31, 2012 40 Featured Case ENTRY Directing Further Proceedings - The plaintiff shall have through 12:00 noon on Friday, September 7, 2012, in which to either seek to drop defendants Tally and Mendez or show cause why they should not be dropped as defendants because Secretary of Transportation LaHood is already a defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/31/2012. Copy Mailed.(JD)
September 17, 2012 46 Featured Case Entry Discussing Motion for Recusal - Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of Judge Pratt [dkt. 32 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/17/2012. Copy Mailed. (JD)
September 25, 2012 48 Featured Case Entry Discussing Pending Motions - The motion for ruling on pending motions [Dkt. # 31 ] is GRANTED. However, it is noted that the motions referred to in the motion for ruling are in fact not pending and were not pending at the time the moti on was filed. The motion to terminate the screening process in advance of the screening having taken place [Dkt. # 45 ] is DENIED. Moody's NEPA claim must be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Federal de fendants, Mr. LaHood and Mr. Tally, are dropped from the action and shall be terminated as parties. No partial final judgment shall issue at this time as to the claim(s) resolved in this Entry. The plaintiff shall have through October 10, 2012, i n which to file a renewed motion for preliminary injunction. The motion seeking the issuance and service of process [Dkt. # 45] is granted to the extent consistent with the Order issued concurrent with that subject. That is, process shall be issued to defendant Victor Mendez. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/25/2012. Copy Mailed. (JD)
December 18, 2012 62 Featured Case ORDER denying 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/18/2012 (copy mailed to Gary W. Moody) (CBU)
March 27, 2014 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 80 83 86 Motions for Summary Judgment. Final Judgment consistent with this Entry and with the Entry of 9/25/2012 shall now issue. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/27/2014 (copy sent to Gary Moody) (CBU)
March 27, 2014 93 Featured Case CLOSED JUDGMENT-Judgment is entered for the Defendant(s) and against the Plaintiff. The Plaintiff shall take nothing by his complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/27/2014 (copy sent to Gary Moody)(CBU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MOODY v. LAHOOD et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL B. CLINE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY LAHOOD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH MCGUINNESS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR MENDEZ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. TALLY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY W. MOODY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]