MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOES 1-9

Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-9
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01115
Filed: August 14, 2012
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 100 Featured Case ORDER denying 77 Motion to require plaintiff to post bond for costs and expenses. ORDER denying as moot 83 Motion to Strike a portion of motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/24/2013 (copy sent to Ho Yeung) (CBU)
November 25, 2013 110 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 108 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 67 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Aaron Reyes. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/25/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
November 25, 2013 111 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 107 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 93 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Leah Justice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/25/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
June 10, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER denying 60 Motion to Strike defts affirmative defenses as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/10/2013 (copy sent to Ho Yeung) (CBU)
June 10, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER denying 59 Motion to Strike defts affirmative defenses as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/10/2013 (copy sent to Ho Yeung) (CBU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOES 1-9
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: Paul J. Nicoletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-9
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]