WALKER v. TRAILER TRANSIT, INC.

Defendant: TRAILER TRANSIT, INC.
Plaintiff: HUBERT E. WALKER
Case Number: 1:2013cv00124
Filed: January 22, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Denise K. LaRue
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS - The Court finds that Mr. Walker cannot prove any set of any facts that would support his claim for relief based upon the allegations set forth in his Complaint. Therefore, Trailer Transit's Moti on for Judgment on the Pleadings (Filing No. 76 ) is GRANTED, and Mr. Walker's Class Action Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Final judgment shall issue in a separate entry. **SEE ORDER** Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/19/2015. (MGG) Modified on 2/20/2015 (MGG).
June 12, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY ON MOTION TO REMAND - Mr. Walker's Motion to Remand (Dkt. 10 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 6/12/2013. (JD)
February 14, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY on Motion for Summary Judgment - Trailer Transit's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 12 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part on Mr. Walker's breach of contract claim, and is GRANTED on Mr. Walker's unjust enrichment claim. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/14/2014. (TRG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. TRAILER TRANSIT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAILER TRANSIT, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Browning
Represented By: Christopher J. Eckhart
Represented By: James H. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUBERT E. WALKER
Represented By: Irwin B. Levin
Represented By: Vess Allen Miller
Represented By: Richard E. Shevitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]