GREEN v. MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. et al

Defendant: MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. and DHC CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC
Plaintiff: EVA M. GREEN
Case Number: 1:2013cv00418
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Leave to File Additional Affirmative Defenses. **SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/1/2014. (MGG)
September 16, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS - The aforementioned reasons, the Court DENIES Defendants' Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. [Dkts. 16 , 26 , 31 .]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/16/2013. (JD)
April 24, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants to Comply with Discovery Obligations. The Court grants the Defendants twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to supplement its responses to Plaintiff's interrogatories and requests for production in a manner consistent with this Order. **SEE ORDER**Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 4/24/2014. (MGG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONARCH RECOVERY MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Peter A. Velde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHC CONSULTING SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Peter A. Velde
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVA M. GREEN
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Steven James Halbert
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]