KETNER v. HOOSIER TRUCK & TRAILER SERVICES et al

Plaintiff: DANIEL J. KETNER
Defendant: KATHY A. SCHULTETI and HOOSIER TRUCK & TRAILER SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2013cv00440
Filed: March 15, 2013
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Tim A. Baker
Presiding Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/17/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD) Modified document type on 4/17/2013 (JD).
May 1, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY - The renewed request to proceed in forma pauperis [Dkt. 19 ] is DENIED as unnecessary because the court granted the earlier request to proceed in forma pauperis on March 21, 2013. The renewed motion for appointment of counsel [Dkt. 16 ] is DENIED for the reasons explained in the Entry of April 17, 2013. The plaintiff's motion for court order to secure access to law library [Dkt. 18 ] is DENIED because this lawsuit is neither a challenge to the lawfulness of the plaintiff& #039;s confinement nor to the conditions of his confinement, meaning that he has no right to access to the courts in connection with this case. Plaintiff shall have a further period of time in this case, through May 24, 2013, in which to either wi thdraw the complaint or show cause why the complaint should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. As he responds to directions in both this case and in No. 2:13-cv-127-WTL-MJD, the plaintiff should be precise as to which case he submits materials for filing. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 5/1/2013. Copy Mailed. (JD)
February 19, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER DISMISSING ACTION - The Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 26 ) is GRANTED. Any claims asserted under Indiana state law are likewise dismissed for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c). All pending motions (Dtks. 28 , 31 , 34 , 41 , 54 , 55 , 60 , 62 , 63 , 66 , 70 and 72 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/19/2014. (JD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KETNER v. HOOSIER TRUCK & TRAILER SERVICES et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL J. KETNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY A. SCHULTETI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOOSIER TRUCK & TRAILER SERVICES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]