EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. et al v. FIFTH THIRD BANK

Plaintiff: D&B VENTURES, LLC, AIR GULF II, LLC, EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. and EMS FLORIDA, INC.
Defendant: FIFTH THIRD BANK
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00582
Filed: April 8, 2013
 
Court: Indiana Southern District Court
Office: Indianapolis Office
Referring Judge: Mark J. Dinsmore
Presiding Judge: William T. Lawrence
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 91 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs and David Bego are granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to make full and complete discovery responses in compliance with the Court's ruling. **SEE ORDER** Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/22/2014. (AH)
November 3, 2014 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion to Compel discovery. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's order as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 11/3/2014. (CBU)
February 24, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Strike Jury Demand. *** SEE ORDER ***. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/24/2014. (CKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. et al v. FIFTH THIRD BANK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&B VENTURES, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Dorelli
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIR GULF II, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Dorelli
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EXECUTIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Dorelli
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMS FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: Michael A. Dorelli
Represented By: Kimberly L. Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIFTH THIRD BANK
Represented By: Stephen Elliot Reynolds
Represented By: Philip A. Whistler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]