Bryant Holdings LLC v. YRC Worldwide Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Bryant Holdings LLC and Stan Better
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc., William D. Zollars, Sheila K. Taylor, Michael Smid, Timothy A. Wicks and Stephen L. Bruffet
Movant: YRC Investors Group
Case Number: 2:2011cv02072
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Kathryn H. Vratil
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling Defendants' 42 Motion To Dismiss Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 9/25/2012. (mg)
November 15, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. The court finds good cause to enter the protective order submitted by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/15/2012. (est)
August 19, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling plaintiffs' 76 Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement (Motion For Preliminary Approval). Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 8/19/2013. (mg)
November 18, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling 81 Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 11/18/2013. (ag)
February 11, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' 85 Second Amended Unopposed Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement is overruled. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 2/20/2015. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 2/11/2015. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant Holdings LLC v. YRC Worldwide Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Holdings LLC
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Better
Represented By: Michael S. Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Jill M. Baisinger
Represented By: David Michael Buffo
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Zollars
Represented By: Jill M. Baisinger
Represented By: David Michael Buffo
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila K. Taylor
Represented By: Jill M. Baisinger
Represented By: David Michael Buffo
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Smid
Represented By: Jill M. Baisinger
Represented By: David Michael Buffo
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A. Wicks
Represented By: Jill M. Baisinger
Represented By: David Michael Buffo
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Bruffet
Represented By: Jill M. Baisinger
Represented By: David Michael Buffo
Represented By: James D. Griffin
Represented By: Karen Pieslak Pohlmann
Represented By: Marc J. Sonnenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: YRC Investors Group
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.