Doe v. Dirty World Entertainment Recordings LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC and Hooman Karamian
Case Number: 2:2009cv00219
Filed: December 23, 2009
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Covington Office
County: Kenton
Presiding Judge: William O. Bertelsman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2010 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Sarah Jones MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT INSTANTER (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Deters, Eric)
August 25, 2010 19 JUDGMENT in favor of Sarah Jones against Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC in the amount of $1 million dollars in compensatory damages and $10 million dollars in punitive damages, with interest thereon at the rate of 0.25 per cent per annum from the date of entry of this judgment, until paid, with costs. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 08/25/2010.(LST)cc: COR
August 25, 2010 18 NARRATIVE by Sarah Jones Filed Pursuant to 17 Order (LST)
August 25, 2010 17 Featured Case ENTRY ORDER FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING held on 08/25/2010 before Judge William O. Bertelsman; 1)Complaint and docket is AMENDED to reflect the real name of the Jane Doe plaintiff as Sarah Jones; 2)Pla's 15 Motion for Default Judgment is GRANTED; 3)Narrative to be ENTERED OF RECORD by the clerk of court; 4)A separate judgment shall enter concurrently. (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 08/25/2010. (LST)cc: COR
August 10, 2010 16 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR DOCKET CALL held on 08/10/2010 before Judge William O. Bertelsman; 1) Evidentiary Hearing re Pla's 15 MOTION for Default Judgment is set for 8/25/2010 10:00 AM in COVINGTON before Judge William O. Bertelsman; 2)Although documents must now be filed electronically with the Court Clerk, a paper court courtesy copy must be provided to Chambers w/in 48 hours of the filing of the brief or memorandum in support of any motion which exceeds 10 pages (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) (LST)cc: COR
August 10, 2010 15 MOTION for Default Judgment by Jane Doe AGAINST DIRTY WORLD ENTERTAINMENT RECORDINGS LLC dba THEDIRT.COM (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deters, Eric)
July 30, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER, ( DOCKET CALL set for 8/10/2010 at 01:00 PM in COVINGTON before Judge William O. Bertelsman.). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/30/2010.(LMB)cc: COR
June 15, 2010 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC cc: COR (LST)CC: Dirty World Entertainment Recordings,LLC
June 14, 2010 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Eric Deters re 10 MOTION for Entry of Default; Error: the incorrect event (Application for Writ) was selected; Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk re-defined the pleading as a Motion for Entry of Default; No further action required by counsel cc: COR (LST)
June 11, 2010 12 Summons Reissued as to Hooman Karamian. (LST)
June 11, 2010 11 NOTICE by Jane Doe OF FILING OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT HOOMAN KARAMIAN (Attachments: # 1 Summons FOR DEFENDANT HOOMAN KARAMIAN)(Deters, Eric)
June 11, 2010 10 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default)(Deters, Eric) Modified to correct event on 6/14/2010 (LST).
May 11, 2010 9 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR DOCKET CALL held on 05/11/2010 before Judge William O. Bertelsman; 1)Pla's 8 Motion for Default Judgment is denied; 2)Counsel is instructed to proceed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.55.; 3)Although documents must now be filed electronically with the Court clerk, a paer court courtesy copy must be provided to chambers w/in 48 hours of the filing of the brief or memorandum in support of any motion, where such brief or memorandum (including any attached exhibits) exceeds 10 pages.(Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) (LST)cc: COR
May 6, 2010 8 MOTION for Default Judgment by Jane Doe (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deters, Eric)
April 29, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER, The Court having reviewed the record and coming to the conclusion that said action should be placed on the Court's next Docket Call, ( DOCKET CALL is set for 5/11/2010 at 01:00 PM in COVINGTON, 35 West 5th Street, 5th Floor Courtroom before Judge William O. Bertelsman.) Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/29/2010.(LMB)cc: COR
March 10, 2010 6 Summons Returned by the Kentucky Secretary of State Unexecuted by Jane Doe as to Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC. (LST)
February 25, 2010 5 Summons via Kentucky Secretary of State Returned Unexecuted by Jane Doe as to Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC. (LST)
February 5, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to Hooman Karamian; issued summons (original and one copy) and returned to counsel via U.s. Mail (TED)
February 5, 2010 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC, Hooman Karamian filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Deters, Eric) Modified text adding dft Karamian on 2/8/2010 (TED).
December 28, 2009 Conflict Check run. (LST)
December 23, 2009 2 Summons Issued as to Dirty World Entertainment Recordings LLC; issued summons returned to counsel via Picked up in Clerk's office with attested copy of Complaint (LST) Modified to change name on 12/30/2009 (LST).
December 23, 2009 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND ( Filing fee $350; receipt number 1650277), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons - Defendant, # 3 Proposed Summons - Blank, # 4 Case Assignment)(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Dirty World Entertainment Recordings LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Eric C. Deters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirty World Entertainment Recordings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hooman Karamian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]