Brown et al v. The Commonwealth of Kentucky et al

Plaintiff: Garry Moore, Garth Kuhnhein, Timothy J. Jones, Brandon Voelker, Terry Donoghue, Lawrence Robinson, Kenneth Moellman, Kenny Brown, Steve Arlinghaus, Brett Gaspard, Phyllis Sparks and Cathy Flaig
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Kentucky, The Kentucky State Board of Elections and Kentucky Legislative Research Commission
Case Number: 2:2013cv00068
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Covington Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: William O. Bertelsman
Referring Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Before: BOGGS, Circuit Judge; VAN TATENHOVE, District Judge; and BERTELSMAN, Senior District Judge: (1) Both groups of plaintiffs in this case are entitled to reasonable attorney fees as prevailing parties; and (2) Pursu ant to FED. R. CIV. P. 72, the defendants' objections regarding the reasonableness of the plaintiffs' requested attorney fees 129 & 131 are referred to the Honorable J. Gregory Wehrman, United States Magistrate Judge for the Eastern District of Kentucky, for his Report and Recommendation. The Magistrate Judge may require such additional briefing and hold such evidentiary or other hearings as he deems appropriate. Dated 1/27/2014.(CBD)cc: COR
June 27, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) DENYING dft Greg Stumbo's 36 Motion to Stay; (2) a separate Scheduling Order shall issue directing the parties of the manner of proceeding & the expedited deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 6/27/13. (KJR)cc: COR
August 16, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Before: BOGGS, Circuit Judge; VAN TATENHOVE, District Judge; and BERTELSMAN, Senior District Judge. PER CURIAM. It is hereby ORDERED, as follows: (1) The Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment 67 is GRANTED; (2) The 2002 state legislative electoral districts, which are currently in place in the Commonwealth of Kentucky, are DECLARED Unconstitutional under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment;(3) The Secretary of State of Kentucky an d the Kentucky Board of Elections are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from administering further elections pursuant to those districts; (4) The Legislative Research Commissions Motion to Dismiss 2012 Elections Claims 68 is DENIED, as moot.This 16th day of August 2013.(CBD)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. The Commonwealth of Kentucky et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Moore
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Kuhnhein
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Jones
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Voelker
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Donoghue
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Robinson
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Moellman
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Brown
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Arlinghaus
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Gaspard
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Sparks
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Flaig
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Richard A. Brueggemann
Represented By: Edward Jason Atkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Clay A. Barkley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kentucky State Board of Elections
Represented By: Noel Embry Caldwell
Represented By: Lynn Sowards Zellen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Legislative Research Commission
Represented By: Laura Hromyak Hendrix
Represented By: Gregory Allen Woosley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]