Lindon v. Kakavand et al

Plaintiff: Tonya Lindon
Defendant: Bahram Kakavand and Kentucky Medical Services Foundation, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00026
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For reasons discussed, Plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Remand by Tonya Lindon is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 09/27/2013. (KLB) cc: COR
August 15, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: Plas' 41 objections to the Magistrate Judge's denial of her motion to compel are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on August 15, 2014. (AWD) cc: COR
November 18, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Dft Dr. Kakavand's 67 Motion in Limine is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. 2. Unless Plt Lindon obtains prior approval from the Court, Plt shall be prohibited from offering evidence at trial re: (i) Dr. Knilans' opinion of Dr. Kakavand's experience as an electrophysiologist; (ii) scope of Dr. Kakavand's EP practice; (iii) Dr. Kakavand's failure to set up telephonic pacemaker checks; and (iv) Dr. Knilans' opinions regarding the credibility of other witnesses. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/18/2014. (STC)cc: COR
November 18, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Plt's 68 Motion in Limine is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. 2. Unless he obtains prior approval from the Court, dft shall be prohibited from offering evidence of any of the following: (i) prior lawsuit against Dr. Timothy Knilans; (ii) sources of collateral payment; (iii) disparaging remarks about attorneys or legal profession; and (iv) financial implications of a verdict against Dr. Kakavand. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/18/2014. (STC)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindon v. Kakavand et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Lindon
Represented By: Robyn Bell Stanton
Represented By: Lea A. Player
Represented By: Douglas H. Morris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bahram Kakavand
Represented By: Stephen J. Mattingly
Represented By: Bradley Aaron Case
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Medical Services Foundation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]