Von Wiegen et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Pamela Von Wiegen and Eric P Von Wiegen
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00040
Filed: February 14, 2013
 
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Fayette
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 10 MOTION to Bifurcate and MOTION to Stay Discovery are GRANTED. 2) Discovery re pla's bad faith claim shall be STAYED and resolution of this claim, together w the plas' claim for punitive damages, shall be DEFERRED and held in ABEYANCE until the underlying claim re UIM coverage has been resolved. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/17/2013.(SCD)cc: COR
December 17, 2013 55 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 37 FIRST MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Certain Comments, Evidence re Other Lawsuits, Testimony is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. 2) Unless the dft obtains prior approval from the Court, the dft including its attys & witnesses, shall be prohibited from offering any of the following (listed within order). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/17/2013.(SCD)cc: COR
January 8, 2014 59 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ordered that pla's Motions to Exclude Dft Shelter Mutual Insurance Company's Expert (DE 32 and 36 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/8/2014. (SCD)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Von Wiegen et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Von Wiegen
Represented By: Jeffrey Brent Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric P Von Wiegen
Represented By: Jeffrey Brent Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James W. Taylor
Represented By: Amelia Brown McCormick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]