Erickson v. University of Kentucky et al

Defendant: University of Kentucky Appeals Board, Parking Department, University of Kentucky, Joseph Fink, III and Lance Broeking
Plaintiff: Heidi K. Erickson
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00052
Filed: February 26, 2013
 
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Lexington Office
County: Bourbon
Presiding Judge: Karl S. Forester
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: (1) 5 MOTION for access to file and review via PACER is DENIED. (2) 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. (3) 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct her complaint is GRANTED. (4) 1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE w respect to all claims against UK, Joseph Fink, in his official capacity, Lance Broeking, in his individual and official capacity, the Parking Dept, and University Appeals Board. (5) Pla is permitted to proceed on her claims against Joseph Fink, II I, individually pursuant to 42 USC 1983. (6) Pla's 10 motion for summons is GRANTED as to Joseph Fink, III and denied in all other respects. (7) Clerk shall prepare and issue summons for Joseph Fink, III in his individual capacity. (8) Clerk s hall prepare a copy of the complaint and USM Form. If insufficient info exists to complete the forms, Clerk shall make a clerk's entyr stating why Clerk cannot fill out the summons or USM form. (9) After Clerk has prepared the summons, USM Form, complaint copy, copy of this Order, Clerk shall hand-deliver said docs to USM. (10) Clerk shall obtain from USM a receipt whuch shall be entered into the instant report. (11) USM shall serve a summons, complaint, and copy of this Order on dft Joseph Fink, III, individually by certified mail, return receipt requested. (12) USM shall make a return report w/in 40 days. (13) Pla shall keep Clerk informed of her current mailing address. (14) For further pleading submit for consideration, Pla shall serve upon the dft or if atty has entered an appearance, upon each atty. Pla shall send the original papers to Clerk for filing w a certificate service. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 10/3/2013.(SCD)cc: COR,USM,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)
March 4, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: (1) Recommended Disposition 25 is ADOPTED as and for the opinion of the Court; (2) this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ;(3) all remaining motions are DENIED as moot; and(4) this matter is STRICKEN from the active docket. Signed by Judge Karl S. Forester on 3/4/2014. (CBD)cc: COR w/ copy to Heidi K. Erickson via US Mail, Lex Diary, Lex JC. Modified cc on 3/4/2014 (CBD).
April 17, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: DENYING pla's 27 Motion to Vacate 27 MOTION for Relief/Vacate 26 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/17/14. (KJR)cc: COR, Pla (US Mail)
May 29, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER: (1) 39 Motion to correct errors is GRANTED. (2) 32 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/29/2014. (SCD)cc: COR,Pro Se Pla(via US Mail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Erickson v. University of Kentucky et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Kentucky Appeals Board
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parking Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Kentucky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Fink, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Broeking
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi K. Erickson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]