Manning v. Epps et al

Case Number: 1:2005cv00256
Filed: April 25, 2006
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 Motion to Produce evidence for DNA; denying 62 Motion to Appoint Expert; granting 63 Motion for permission to subpoena records. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 10/03/2008. (pbs, USDC)
November 3, 2008 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion for a scheduling order.Petitioner has until 1/02/2009 to file supplement to petition. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 11/03/2008. (pbs, USDC)
December 8, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion for Expert Funds. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 12/08/2009. (pbs, USDC)
December 29, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER in accordance with the Memorandum Opinion dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 12/29/2009. (pbs, USDC)
December 29, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT in accordance with the Memorandum Opinion denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. CASE CLOSED. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 12/29/2009. (pbs, USDC)
December 29, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 82 Order and 83 Final Judgment. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 12/29/2009. (pbs, USDC)
March 2, 2010 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 3/02/2010. (pbs, USDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Epps et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]