Mitchell v. City of Tupelo, Mississippi

Plaintiff: Latisha Mitchell
Defendant: City of Tupelo, Mississippi
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00049
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A. Sanders
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of City of Tupelo, Mississippi against Latisha Mitchell as to disability discrimination claim. JUDGMENT in favor of Latisha Mitchell against City of Tupelo, Mississippi as to retaliation claim. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/30/2014. (bkl)
September 30, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of City of Tupelo, Mississippi against Latisha Mitchell as to disability discrimination claim. JUDGMENT in favor of Latisha Mitchell against City of Tupelo, Mississippi as to retaliation claim. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/30/2014. (bkl)
September 11, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 76 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/11/2014. (bkl)
September 11, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 89 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/11/2014. (bkl)
September 12, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/12/2014. (bkl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mitchell v. City of Tupelo, Mississippi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latisha Mitchell
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Tupelo, Mississippi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]