Pamperin, Inc. v. Plass et al

Plaintiff: Pamperin, Inc.
Defendant: Patrick Plass, Lila Plass, Plass Properties, L.L.C. and Converta Kiln, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00035
Filed: February 20, 2009
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Tishomingo
Referring Judge: David A. Sanders
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discovery due by 2/22/2010. Motions due by 3/1/2010.. Signed by David A. Sanders on 12/14/2009. (sef, USDC)
February 16, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Compel. Signed by David A. Sanders on 2/15/2010. (sef)
February 16, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER temporarily denying 54 Motion to Compel; temporarily denying 56 Motion to Compel. Signed by David A. Sanders on 2/16/2010. (sef)
March 30, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Transfer. Case transferred to Western District of Tennessee. Signed by Neal B. Biggers on 3/30/2010. (llw, USDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamperin, Inc. v. Plass et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamperin, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Hendrix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Plass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lila Plass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plass Properties, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Converta Kiln, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.