Murphey et al v. Pella Windows and Doors, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Carole Murphey and Smith Murphey
Defendant: Pella Windows and Doors, Inc., J.F. Day, Inc. and Kevin Connor
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00227
Filed: December 29, 2010
 
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Panola
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Referring Judge: David A. Sanders
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by David A. Sanders on 4/6/2011. (sef)
February 23, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring defendants and their counsel to file the entire state court record on or before March 4, 2011 or risk sanctions. Signed by David A. Sanders on 2/23/11. (ncb)
November 1, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Compel. Signed by Jane M Virden on 11/1/11. (ncb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Murphey et al v. Pella Windows and Doors, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Murphey
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Murphey
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pella Windows and Doors, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Pierce
Represented By: Michael A. Montgomery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F. Day, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Montgomery
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Connor
Represented By: Michael A. Montgomery
Represented By: Jeffrey Grant Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]