United States of America v. Powell et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Robert Steven Powell, Peggy McCabe Powell and Texore Investment Club, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00110
Filed: June 20, 2012
 
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Tate
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 50 Order on Motions. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/4/2013. (psk)
September 26, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Peggy Powell's motion for extension 4 to the extent it relates to the attorney and case management conferences and initial disclosure requirements. Said deadlines are STAYED for thirty (30) days, within which counsel for Peggy Powell shall enter a formal appearance or Powell shall notify the court in writing of a decision to proceed without counsel. Signed by Jane M Virden on 9/26/12. (ncb)
March 18, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 67 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/18/2014. (psk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Powell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Felicia C. Adams
Represented By: Steven Christopher Woodliff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Steven Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy McCabe Powell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texore Investment Club, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]