Humphrey v. Citibank NA et al

Plaintiff: Ruby Jean Humphrey
Defendant: Citibank NA and Citi Mortgage Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00148
Filed: August 10, 2012
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Tunica
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 13 Report and Recommendations.Signed by Michael P. Mills on 1/24/2013. (lpm)
May 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The clerk shall forthwith file the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff has 21 days from this date to complete service of process. Signed by Jane M Virden on 5/9/13. (ncb)
September 25, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Michael P. Mills on 9/25/2013. (lpm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphrey v. Citibank NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Jean Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank NA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Mortgage Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]