Russell v. Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Dugan Calvin Russell
Defendant: LTCAmerica Insurance Company, Life USA Insurance Company, XYZ Corporations 1-50 and Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2013cv00030
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Referring Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/12/14. (bds)
December 31, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/31/2014.
January 8, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Robert Vance. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 01/08/2015. (mb)
January 8, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion in Limine; granting 126 Motion in Limine; granting 127 Motion in Limine; granting 128 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 01/08/2015. (mb)
May 17, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Stay. Signed by Jane M Virden on 5/17/13. (ncb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dugan Calvin Russell
Represented By: John Kevin Cavender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTCAmerica Insurance Company
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life USA Insurance Company
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Markham R. Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.