Thomas et al v. Firerock Products,LLC et al

Defendant: Firerock Products,LLC and General Shale Brick, Inc.
Plaintiff: Smith Murphey, Amy Thomas, John Thomas and Carole Murphey
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00109
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: Mississippi Northern District Court
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Panola
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion to Strike and AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Plaintiffs shall be allowed until 5pm on June 27, 2014, to provide the Rule 26 required information. Defendants Designation of Experts is now due July 28, 2014; Discovery is now due September 22, 2014; Motions are now due October 9, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 06/25/2014. (lec)
August 22, 2014 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/22/14. (bds)
October 14, 2014 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING re 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment (No Warranty by Fire Rock Products, LLC (Corrected) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Limited Warranty) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, [116 ] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs - Breach of Implied Warranty of Fitness for a Particular Purpose filed by General Shale Brick, Inc., 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Murphey Plaintiffs' Claims - Prior Release) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 71 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Breach of Implied Warranty of Fitness for Particular Purpose) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Carole Murphey and Smith Murphey filed by General Shale Brick, Inc., 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Violation of Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 187 MOTION for Partial S ummary Judgment (Punitive Damages) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs - Express Warranty Claim filed by General Shale Brick, Inc., 145 MOTION for Partial Summary Jud gment (Breach of Implied Warranty of Merchantability) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, Motions terminated: 148 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Requesting Jury Interrogatories or Verdict Form filed by Selective W ay Insurance Company, 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Punitive Damages) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 99 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Violation of Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act) filed by Firerock Products,L LC, 71 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Breach of Implied Warranty of Fitness for Particular Purpose) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 191 MOTION for Summary Judgment (No Warranty by Fire Rock Products, LLC (Corrected) fi led by Firerock Products,LLC, 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs Carole Murphey and Smith Murphey filed by General Shale Brick, Inc., 145 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Breach of Implied Warranty o f Merchantability) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 116 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs - Breach of Implied Warranty of Fitness for a Particular Purpose filed by General Shale Brick, Inc., 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Limited Warranty) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 193 MOTION for Sanctions (Service of False Discovery Response) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Murphey Plainti ffs' Claims - Prior Release) filed by Firerock Products,LLC, 114 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Plaintiffs - Express Warranty Claim filed by General Shale Brick, Inc... Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/14/14. (tab)
February 14, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ORE TENUS MOTION for leave to be relieved of the requirement of L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(3). Signed by Jane M Virden on 02/14/2014. (lec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Firerock Products,LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firerock Products,LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Shale Brick, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith Murphey
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Thomas
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Murphey
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]