Prater v. Wilkinson County, Mississippi et al

Defendant: Wilkinson County, Mississippi Board of Supervisors, Will Seal, Bill Bankston, Wilkinson County, Mississippi and Jennings Nettles
Plaintiff: Easter Prater
Case Number: 5:2013cv00023
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Wilkinson
Referring Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss Wilkinson County Board of Supervisors Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/5/2013 (ECW)
November 5, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/5/2013 (ECW)
November 5, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss state law claims Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/5/2013 (ECW)
October 8, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 8, 2014. (AA)
October 28, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File; finding as moot 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 28 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 28, 2014. (AA)
December 19, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on December 18, 2014. (AA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prater v. Wilkinson County, Mississippi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkinson County, Mississippi Board of Supervisors
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Seal
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Bankston
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilkinson County, Mississippi
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennings Nettles
Represented By: William Robert Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Easter Prater
Represented By: Carroll Edward Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]