Snider v. Cape Girardeau, City of et al

Plaintiff: Frank L Snider, III
Defendant: Cape Girardeau, City of and Matthew Peters
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00100
Filed: July 6, 2010
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Cape Girardeau
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2012 117 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION..The Court concludes that plaintiff is not entitled to an award of punitive damages. The plaintiff will be awarded compensatory damages in the sum of $7,000.00 on his claim against defendant Peters. An appropriate judgment will be entered separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 12/14/12. (MRS)
January 23, 2013 142 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 132 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Plaintiff Frank L Snider, III. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to alter judgment [Doc. #132] is granted with respect to the entry of judgment on Count I of the second amended complaint. The motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/23/13. (CSG)
January 11, 2011 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Frank L Snider, III motion is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 1/11/11. (MRS)
June 3, 2011 61 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by Intervenor State of Missouri motion is GRANTED...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the State of Missouris motion for summary judgment.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than June 24, 2011, plaintiff shallfile a response to the State of Missouris motion for summary judgment; the reply brief shall be filed no later than July 1, 2011. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 6/3/11. (MRS)
December 19, 2011 81 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..DENYING 46 MOTION to Strike 41 Statement of Material Facts,,,, Delcaration of Plaintiff Frank L. Snider, III attached to filed by Defendant H. Morley Swingle, Defendant Matthew Peters, Defendant Cape Girardeau, City o f,..DENYING 75 MOTION to Strike 72 Memorandum in Support of Motion Affidavits of Anthony E. Rothert, Elizabeth M. Phelps and Rebecca A. Phelps-Davis filed by Defendant H. Morley Swingle, Defendant Matthew Peters, Defendant Cape Girardeau, City of. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 12/19/11. (MRS)
March 20, 2012 82 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Intervenor State of Missouri, 73 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Frank L Snider, III, 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Frank L Snider, III. IT I S HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [Doc. #40] is granted with respect to Count I. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a permanent injunction [Doc. #73] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of intervenor State of Missouri for summary judgment [Doc. #62] is denied. A judgment consistent with this Memorandum and Order will be entered upon the disposition of all claims. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/20/12. (CSG)
March 21, 2012 84 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for summary judgment [Doc. #40] is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. re: 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant H. Morley Swingle, Defendant Matthew P eters, Defendant Cape Girardeau, City of motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant City of Cape Girardeau for summary judgment [Doc. #47] is granted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claim for declaratory relief in CountII and plaintiff's claims against defendant H. Morley Swingle in Count III aredismissed as moot. A judgment consistent with this Memorandum and Order will be entered upon disposition of all claims. By separate order, this matter will be set for nonjury trial with respect to plaintiff's claim for damages against defendant Peters. Signed by Honorable Carol E. Jackson on 3/21/12. (MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Snider v. Cape Girardeau, City of et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank L Snider, III
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Girardeau, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]