Morgan v. Wallace et al

Defendant: Cheryl Thompson and Ian Wallace
Plaintiff: Clinton Wayne Morgan
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00013
Filed: January 28, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Cheryl Thompson, Defendant Ian Wallace. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss [Doc. #17] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' shall respond to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction within twenty (20) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. (Response to Court due by 6/24/2013.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/3/13. (CSG)
November 8, 2013 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Clinton Wayne Morgan motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/8/13. (MRS)
March 12, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Clinton Wayne Morgan motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the no initial partial filing fee shall beassessed at this ti me. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants Wallace and Thompson in their individual capacities through the waiver agreement the Court maintains with the Missouri Attorney General's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendant Wallace and Thompson shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rul es of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to plaintiffs claims against defendants in their official capacities because these claims are legally frivolous or fai l to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to plaintiffs claims that defendants failed to respond to his grievances in a t imely manner because these claims are legally frivolous or fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/12/13. (MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morgan v. Wallace et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Thompson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Wayne Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]