Whittington et al v. Isgrig et al

Plaintiff: Victoria Whittington and Maegen Bright
Defendant: Mark Isgrig and Missouri Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2013cv00016
Filed: February 28, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Audrain
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant Mark Isgrig to dismiss (Doc. 24 ) is sustained in part and denied in part. The court dismisses plaintiffs claims against defendant Mark Isgrig in his official capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendants George Lombardi and Patricia Cornell to dismiss (Doc. 27 ) is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant Angela Mesmer to dismiss (Doc. 34 ) is sustained. The court dismisses plaintiffs claims against defendant Angela Mesmer in her official capacity. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/6/13. (KJS)
March 12, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, in accordance with the specific instructions set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/12/13. (KJS)
April 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to this Courts differentiated case management system, this case is assigned to Track 5B (prisoner actions-standard). The Court notes that because plaintiffs paid the filing fee, they are resp onsible for serving defendants. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall reply to the amended complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 4/12/13. (KJS)
October 16, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs to add the claim of Sondra Loness (Doc. 70 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs may have 21 days to renew this motion with a proposed amended complaint attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/16/14. (KJS)
November 10, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs to add the claim of Sondra Loness (Doc. 73 ) is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs have until November 21, 2014 to file their, as yet unsigned, second amended com plaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file not later than December 19, 2014, a proposed joint amended case management order, which addresses necessary additional discovery and motion practice, and any need for a new trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/10/14. (KXS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whittington et al v. Isgrig et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Whittington
Represented By: Mark R. Bahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maegen Bright
Represented By: Mark R. Bahn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Isgrig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]