Devoto v. Minor et al

Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections, Dean Minor and Corizon, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Devoto
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00019
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Corizon, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss For Want of Prosecution [ECF No. 23 ] is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [ECF No. 5 ] is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on January 27, 2014. (BRP)
March 20, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $37.82 within t hirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to submit an amended complaint within thirty (30) days, this action will be dismissed without further proceedings. ( Response to Court due by 4/19/2013.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/20/2013. (CBL)
April 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Missouri Department of Corrections is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on April 25, 2013. (BRP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Devoto v. Minor et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Minor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Devoto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]