Apperson v. Auto Owners Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Larry Apperson
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Larry Apperson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00035
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Larry Apperson's motion to remand 18 is DENIED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Larry Apperson's motion to dismiss 11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Auto Owners' Affirmative Defenses D and E are dismissed. Auto Owners' counterclaim is dismissed to the extent it requires a review of the underlying state court judgment.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 7/31/13. (LGK)
November 5, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 30 MOTION for Leave to File its Third-Party Complaint Out of Time filed by Defendant Auto Owners Insurance Company motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/5/13. (LGK)
February 13, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Third Party Defendant Wayne Pruitt motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/13/14. (LGK)
April 22, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The cause number 4:13cv00757 NAB was filed in the Eastern Division of this court April 19, 2013 and assigned to the Honorable Nannette A. Baker. Because the jurisdiction of this matter lies in the Northern Division of this district, this case should have been assigned a Northern Division case number. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the cause number 4:13cv00757 NAB is transferred to the Northern Division of this court and assigned the above styled Case No.2:13cv00035 RWS. The Honorable Rodney W. Sippel will preside. Case No. 4:13cv00757 NAB is hereby administratively closed. Dated this 22nd day of April, 2013. Signed by James G. Woodward, Clerk of Court.(SAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apperson v. Auto Owners Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Apperson
Represented By: Christian L. Faiella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell F. Watters
Represented By: Cynthia M. Juedemann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Cynthia M. Juedemann
Represented By: Russell F. Watters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Larry Apperson
Represented By: Christian L. Faiella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]