Howard v. Missouri Bone and Joint Center, Inc.

 
Case Number: 4:2005cv01333
Filed: August 24, 2005
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2010 134 Featured Case ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Directed to Garnishee Pursuant to Rule 90.08, Missouri Rules of Civil Procedure [Doc. #131] is granted. Dr. Leo Whiteside, garnishee herein, is to fully answer the Interrogatories Directed to Garnishee within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. 131 Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 9/16/10. (CLA)
March 23, 2009 51 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Pltff.'s mtn. in limine is granted in part. The mtn. is granted to exclude information regarding pltff.'s criminal history, at this point, unless deft. can produce evid. of a conviction, at which time, deft. may see rec onsideration. The mtn. is granted with respect to whether deft. does or does not have insurance. The mtn. is granted with respect to the financial condition of deft. The mtn. is granted with respect t opltff.'s children born out of wedlock. The court reserves ruling on the mtn. on the "release and waiver of liability contained in deft.'s registration/consent release" form until such time as a copy of the registration/consent release form is produced for the court's inspe ction. The mtn. is granted with respect to any medical and medical causation opinions of Michael Hadden. Mr. Hadden can, however, testify with respect to standards applicable to athletic trainers and as to deft. and Kevin Templin's adherence to the standards applicable to athletic trainers with regard to pltff.'s participation. The mtn. as to any physical injuries to any part of pltff.'s body prior to or subsequent to 1/10/01 is granted at this time, except to the extent of any ev idence that they are related to the injury at trial. Deft.'s mtn. in limine is granted, with the exception that pltff. may testify that he might have had a dream of playing professional football some day. SO ORDERED HEA 40 38 . Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 3/23/09. (CLA)
July 17, 2009 71 Featured Case OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 65 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or in the Alternative, for New Trial, [Doc. No.65], is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 7/17/09. (CSR)
February 17, 2010 96 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pltff.'s 92 MOTION to Consolidate Cases is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenor's 95 MOTION to Dismiss pltff.'s mtn. to consolidate is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Henry E. Autrey on 2/17/10. (CLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Howard v. Missouri Bone and Joint Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]