Day et al v. Robinwood West Community Improvement District

Plaintiff: Noel A. Day, Aimee N. Pavey, James M. Strake and Barbara E. Monroney
Defendant: Robinwood West Community Improvement District
 
Case Number: 4:2008cv01888
Filed: December 8, 2008
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Voting Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2009 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [doc. # 16 ] is GRANTED. Defendant Robinwood West Community Improvement District, its officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons acting in concert with them, or in connection with them, are enjoined from permitting any qualified voter to receive, cast, or have counted more than one vote in any election. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 4/29/09. (KLH)
July 10, 2009 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Production of Documents [doc. # 45 ] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Defendant must produce newsletters from July 2007 through the present, and Mr. Polt shall disclose any audio or video recordings of Defendant's meetings in his possession. These items shall be produced to Plaintiffs on or before July 17, 2009. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 7/10/09. (KLH)
November 2, 2009 62 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [doc. #40] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Statement of Material Facts [doc. #53] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on November 2, 2009. (MCB)
February 16, 2010 72 Featured Case AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [doc. # 40 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Strike Statement of Material Facts [doc. # 53 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 2/16/10. (KLH)
December 29, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER re 7 , 4 ORDERED that Defendant's motion (Doc. #7) for an extension of time to file an answer is GRANTED in part, such that Defendant shall haveup to and including January 12, 2009, to file an answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the part ies shall confer with regard to Plaintiffs' motion for limited expedited discovery (Doc. #4). In the event the parties are unable to reach an agreement with regard to Plaintiffs' motion, Defendant shall also have until January 12, 2009, to respond to Plaintiffs' motion for expedited discovery. ( Response to Court due by 1/12/2009.). Signed by Mag Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/29/08. (CEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Day et al v. Robinwood West Community Improvement District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel A. Day
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee N. Pavey
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Strake
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara E. Monroney
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinwood West Community Improvement District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]