A. v. St. John's Mercy Health System

Plaintiff: T. A.
Defendant: St. John's Mercy Health System
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv00069
Filed: January 8, 2009
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Donald J. Stohr
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2010 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion in Limine [doc. #101] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defense Motion in Limine to Preclude Hearsay Evidence from Plaintiff Regarding Comments Allegedly Made at the Hospital [doc. #103] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' First Motion in Limine [doc. #104] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Second Motion in Limine [doc. #105] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Joint Defendant s' Motion in Limine to Bar Plaintiff from Offering Medical or Nursing Conclusions [doc. #106] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Third Motion in Limine [doc. #107] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Four th Motion in Limine [doc. #109] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Fifth Motion in Limine [doc. #111] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Le ah Hochbaum [doc. #112] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude and Bar Causation Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Paul Levi sohn [doc. #114] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine to Limit and Exclude the Causation Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert David Polaner [doc. #116] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaint iff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Leah Hochbaum [doc. #118], Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude and Bar Causation Testimony an d Opinions of Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Paul Levisohn [doc. #119], and Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude the Causation Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert David Polaner [doc. #120] are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Have Certain Witnesses Appear at Trial by Video Link [doc. #129] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as set forth above. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 10/13/2010. (MGK)
January 7, 2011 176 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(a)(1)(A) [doc. # 165 ] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on 1/7/11. (KLH)
September 2, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Renewed Joint Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Designation of Rebuttal Expert and Bar Testimony of Dr. Paul Levisohn [doc. #71] is DENIED. Signed by Honorable E. Richard Webber on September 2, 2010. (MGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: A. v. St. John's Mercy Health System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. A.
Represented By: Stuart A. Jay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. John's Mercy Health System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]