Riceland Foods, Inc. et al v. SCF Marine, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Riceland Foods, Inc. and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: SCF Marine, Inc. and Cooper T. Smith Stevedoring Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv00830
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss [# 22 ] is granted, and defendant Cooper T. Smith Stevedoring Co., Inc., is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 9/9/09. (KLH)
September 24, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiffs shall, no later than September 29, 2009, file either a memorandum explaining why they are seeking to transfer this suit instead of dismissing it, or a motion for voluntary dismissal. Response to Court due by 9/29/2009. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 9/24/09. (KLH)
February 16, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to transfer [# 29 ] is reinstated. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion to file a supplemental brief [# 43 ] is granted, and defendant's supplemental brief shall be filed no late r than fourteen days from the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs may file any supplemental reply brief no later than fourteen days after defendant's supplemental brief is filed. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 2/16/10. (KLH, modified #29 to reflect pending motion)
April 21, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to transfer [#29] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case will be set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference by separate Order. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on April 21, 2010. (MGK)
June 2, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to consolidate [#57] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is consolidated with Riceland Foods, Inc. et al., v. SCF Marine, Inc., Cause Number 4:09CV1941 CEJ, for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that from this date forward all papers shall be filed in this case only, that no further pleadings or papers be filed in Cause Number 4:09CV1941 CEJ and the Cause Number 4:09CV1941 CEJ is administratively closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to supplement [#59] is granted.(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riceland Foods, Inc. et al v. SCF Marine, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riceland Foods, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: John S. Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCF Marine, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper T. Smith Stevedoring Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]