McKenna v. St. Louis County Police Department et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Gregory McKenna
Defendant: St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Mark Kappelhoff, Apple Inc., A-1 Private Investigations, Timothy Bonine and D'Angelo Automotive
 
Case Number: 4:2009cv01113
Filed: July 15, 2009
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 82. Tue Dec 21 14:50:56 CST 2010 (Kirkland, Beth)
December 21, 2010 82 MANDATE of USCA as to 69 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory McKenna USCA #:10-2277(BAK)
December 21, 2010 81 Featured Case ORDER of USCA USCA Appeal #: 10-2277. Appellant's request for disclosure of the names of judges voting aginst appellant's petition for rehearing en banc has been considered by the court and is denied. Appellant's petition for rehearing en banc was submitted to the court, and no judge called for a vote on the petition. Judge Gruender did not participate in the consideration or decision of this matter. (BAK)
December 14, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 80. copy of USCA Order 80 mailed this date to non electronic party Tue Dec 14 09:31:51 CST 2010 (Kost, Mary)
December 14, 2010 80 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 69 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory McKenna USCA Appeal #: 10-2277. Appellant's motion to publish the court's decision is denied.(MGK)
December 14, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 79. copy of USCA Order 79 mailed this date to non electronic party Tue Dec 14 09:29:31 CST 2010 (Kost, Mary)
December 14, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 69 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory McKenna USCA Appeal #: 10-2277. The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The petition for rehearing by the panel is also denied. Judge Gruender took no part in the consideration or decision of this matter. (MGK)
September 27, 2010 78 LETTER from USCA USCA Appeal #: 10-2277. The data for the above-referenced case originally showed the case tye as private civil. The data has been changed to U.S. civil, thereby extending the time to 45 days from the entry date of the judgment for filing a petition for rehearing. The due date in now 11/1/10, for filing a timely rehearing petition.(BAK)
September 16, 2010 77 JUDGMENT of USCA as to 69 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory McKenna. USCA Appeal #: 10-2277. The district court's orders denying recusal, denying an extension of time to file a notice of appeal, and denying relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b) are summarily affirmed under Eighth Circuit Rule 47A(a). (RJD)
August 23, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 76. Sent to non-electronic party. Mon Aug 23 14:16:49 CDT 2010 (Douglas, Ronald)
August 23, 2010 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for relief from judgment [#74] is denied. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 8/23/2010. (RJD)
August 4, 2010 75 EXHIBITS (Video Exhibits 3-7) re: 74 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna.(KLH, disc maintained in the Clerk's Office)
August 4, 2010 74 MOTION for Relief from Judgment by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2a, # 4 Exhibit 2b)(KLH)
June 10, 2010 73 Featured Case ORDER of USCA USCA Appeal #: 10-2277. If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. Kindly submit these documents within 10 days. (BAK)
June 10, 2010 72 Initial Notification from USCA for 69 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory McKenna USCA Appeal Number: 10-2277. Your appeal is being referred to the court. No briefing schedule will be established, and no additional pleadings are required from you. Our office will advise you of any action taken in your case.(BAK)
June 9, 2010 71 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 69 Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal filed on 06/07/2010 by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(JMW)
June 8, 2010 Receipt 4644014911 in the amount of $455.00 for NOTICE OF APPEAL/DOCKET FEE on behalf of George McKenna (CCAM)
June 7, 2010 70 Letter re: payment method for 69 Notice of Appeal by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (Attachment(s): # 1 Envelope)(RJD)
June 7, 2010 69 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 56 Judgment - (Case), 55 Memorandum & Order, 63 Memorandum & Order, 68 Memorandum & Order, and 65 Memorandum & Order by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
May 12, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 68. Sent to non-electronic party. Wed May 12 14:30:21 CDT 2010 (Douglas, Ronald)
May 12, 2010 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions to extend the time to file his notice of appeal [#66 and #67] are denied. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 5/12/2010. (RJD)
May 10, 2010 67 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Appeal by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
May 10, 2010 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Appeal by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
April 20, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 65. Tue Apr 20 13:53:24 CDT 2010 (Hisaw, Kari)
April 20, 2010 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to amend the judgment [# 64 ] is denied. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 4/20/10. (KLH)
April 19, 2010 64 MOTION FOR AN AMENDED JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (MGK)
March 22, 2010 62 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna re: 60 PRO SE MOTION. (RJD)
March 19, 2010 61 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re: 60 MOTION filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
March 19, 2010 60 MOTION to Disqualify United States District Court Judge Catherine Perry by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Envelope)(RJD)
January 4, 2010 59 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD) Modified on 1/4/2010 (RJD).
January 4, 2010 58 Memorandum In Support re: 57 Request by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
January 4, 2010 57 Request for an Order In Response to His Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
January 4, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Mon Jan 4 14:51:46 CST 2010 (Kost, Mary)
January 4, 2010 56 JUDGMENT. In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered this same date,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Counts I-VI of plaintiff's complaint are dismissed with prejudice. The state-law counts, Counts VII-XVI, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on January 4, 2010. (MGK)
January 4, 2010 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Mon Jan 4 14:47:39 CST 2010 (Kost, Mary)
January 4, 2010 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motions to dismiss [#8, #11, #29, #42, #50] are granted, and Counts I-VI of plaintiffs complaint as against these defendants are dismissed, with prejudice. Counts VII-XVI are dismissed as against these defendants without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's complaint as against defendants A-1 Private Investigations and Timothy Bonine is dismissed under 12(h)(3) for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to amendhis complaint [#38] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining pending motions are denied.Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on January 4, 2010. (MGK)
December 22, 2009 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS MARK KAPPELHOFF AND A1 INVESTIGATIONS, filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(KLH)
December 22, 2009 53 REPLY (Memorandum in Support) to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS MARK KAPPELHOFF AND A1 INVESTIGATIONS, filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
December 21, 2009 52 NOTICE by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna to the Court Regarding his Motion to Respond to Defendants St. Louis County Police, Charles Boschert, and Kenneth Williams' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Complaint (KLH)
December 18, 2009 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 18, 2009 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 15, 2009 49 RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION for Leave to to Amend Complaint filed by Defendant D'Angelo Automotive. (Lewis, Thomas)
December 14, 2009 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: [#47] sent to:Gregory McKenna, 9937 Young Drive, H, Beverly Hills, CA 90212, (see receipt) Mon Dec 14 09:05:48 CST 2009 (Berg, Melanie) Modified on 12/14/2009 (MCB).
December 11, 2009 48 RESPONSE to Motion re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert) (RJD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2009: # 1 Memorandum) (RJD). Modified on 12/16/2009 (RJD). Modified on 12/16/2009 (Berg, Melanie).
December 11, 2009 47 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 44 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 12/11/09. (CDP)
December 9, 2009 46 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert)
December 9, 2009 45 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert)
December 9, 2009 44 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 9, 2009 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by Defendant Mark Kappelhoff. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 9, 2009 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted by Defendant Mark Kappelhoff. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
December 7, 2009 41 NOTICE to Court regarding Defendant Kappelhoff's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 31 by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna; (copy of 31 mailed to plaintiff at 9937 Young Drive, H, Beverly Hills, CA 90212); (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(DJO)
November 30, 2009 40 RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION for Leave to to Amend Complaint filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
November 24, 2009 39 PRO SE MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena upon FBI by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
November 20, 2009 38 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint)(KLH)
November 13, 2009 37 MEMORANDUM in Support of Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
November 13, 2009 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
November 10, 2009 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: Doc. #35 (see receipt) Tue Nov 10 08:39:05 CST 2009 (Douglas, Ronald) Modified on 11/10/2009 (RJD).
November 10, 2009 35 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation; ORDERED GRANTED. Responsive Pleading due on or before December 9, 2009. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 11/10/09. (RJD)
November 9, 2009 34 Alias Summons Reissued as to defendant Timothy Bonine. (sent to plaintiff for service this date.)(MCB) (MCB).
November 9, 2009 33 Letter to Clerk of Court from Gregory McKenna re:filled out summons on defendant Timothy Bonine (alias summons signed and returned back to plaintiff for service.) (MCB)
November 9, 2009 32 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
November 6, 2009 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 PRO SE MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Mark Kappelhoff filed by Defendant Mark Kappelhoff. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
October 30, 2009 30 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert)
October 30, 2009 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert)
October 30, 2009 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re: 27 PRO SE MOTION filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
October 30, 2009 27 MOTION TO PROFFER EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (CD-R attached) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Envelope)(RJD)
October 30, 2009 26 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS MARK KAPPELHOFF AND A1 INVESTIGATIONS by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Envelope)(RJD)
October 30, 2009 25 MEMORANDUM to Court by Defendant D'Angelo Automotive. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lewis, Thomas)
October 30, 2009 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Fri Oct 30 13:40:42 CDT 2009 (Hisaw, Kari)
October 30, 2009 24 Featured Case ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time [# 23 ] to respond to defendants Apple Inc.'s and DAngelo Automotive's motions to dismiss is granted, and his response to these motions is now due on November 13, 2009. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/30/09. (KLH)
October 29, 2009 23 MOTION for Extension of Time and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (KLH)
October 26, 2009 22 Letter to Gregory McKenna from Clerk of the Court re: summons. (RJD)
October 26, 2009 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion filed by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD) Modified text on 10/27/2009 (KLH).
October 26, 2009 20 PRO SE MOTION for Stay of Proceedings by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
October 26, 2009 19 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. Process Server: St. Charles County Sheriff's Department. (RJD)
October 26, 2009 18 Request For Alias Summons by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (RJD)
October 23, 2009 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Fri Oct 23 10:22:49 CDT 2009 (Kost, Mary)
October 23, 2009 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer ; ORDERED GRANTED Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on October 23, 2009. (MGK)
October 22, 2009 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert)
October 22, 2009 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert C. Moore for Defendants St. Louis County Police Department, Charles Boschert, Kenneth Williams. (Moore, Robert)
October 20, 2009 Featured Case ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Tue Oct 20 15:53:08 CDT 2009 (Spurgeon, Katherine)
October 20, 2009 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order [#13] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause in writing no later than Wednesday, November 3, 2009, why defendant Apple, Inc.'s motion to dismiss [#8] and defendant D'Angelo Automotive's motion to dismiss [#11] should not be granted. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 10/20/09. (KXS)
October 13, 2009 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (entitled: Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna. (MCB)
October 12, 2009 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant D'Angelo Automotive. (Lewis, Thomas)
October 12, 2009 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant D'Angelo Automotive. (Lewis, Thomas)
October 5, 2009 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
October 5, 2009 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
October 5, 2009 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Wisniewski, Kathy)
September 29, 2009 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gregory McKenna as to A-1 Private Investigations, Timothy Bonine. (KLH)
September 29, 2009 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Gregory McKenna. D'Angelo Automotive served on 9/17/2009, answer due 10/7/2009; St. Louis County Police Department served on 9/15/2009, answer due 10/5/2009; Charles Boschert served on 9/15/2009, answer due 10/5/2009; Kenneth Williams served on 9/15/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (KLH)
July 16, 2009 5 LETTER from clerk to pro se plaintiff. re:case has been filed and service documents enclosed for you to effect service. Service must be made within 120 days of the filing of the complaint (in the instant case, within 120 days of the payment of the filing fee). (KCM)
July 15, 2009 Receipt 4644008610 in the amount of $350.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Gregory M. McKenna (CCAM)
July 15, 2009 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna Process Server: St. Louis County Sheriff's Office (KCM)
July 15, 2009 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna Process Server: Al's Primetime Process Serving (KCM)
July 15, 2009 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Gregory McKenna Process Server: Quick Call Process Servers (KCM)
July 15, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants 10 Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued 1, Disclosure of Corporate Interest issued to Defendant Apple Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Gregory McKenna. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Waiver of Service and Summons)(KCM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McKenna v. St. Louis County Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory McKenna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Boschert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kappelhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Private Investigations
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bonine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Angelo Automotive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]