Goodman Distribution, Inc. v. Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Goodman Distribution, Inc.
Defendant: Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc. and Mary A. Haaf
Case Number: 4:2010cv00806
Filed: May 3, 2010
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants Mary Haaf and Herb Haaf Hearing and Cooling, Inc.'s motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim is DENIED. [Doc. 9] IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that defendants Mary Haaf and Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc.'s motion to dismiss for improper venue, or in the alternative to transfer to the Western District of Missouri is DENIED.[Doc. 11] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Mary Haaf and Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling,Inc.'s motion to strike Exhibit C to the complaint is DENIED.[Doc. 13]. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 10/19/2010. (MRC)
April 5, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel's motion to withdraw is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 40] Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 4/5/2011. (NCL)
December 30, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defense counsel's motion for the imposition of a withdrawal notice period is GRANTED. [Doc. 51] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Mary Haaf and defendant/counter-claimant Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc. shall obtain substitute counsel no later than February 10, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Mary Haaf and defendant/counter-claimant Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc.'s substitute counsel shall file a n entry of appearance no later than February 10, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel shall provide a copy of this order to Mary Haaf and the registered agent for Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc., and file a certification with t he Court that this has been done within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on Feburary 10, 2012, or upon the entry of substitute counsel, whichever comes earlier, the Court will issue an order granting the requ est of attorneys David R. Bohm, Jeffery R. Schmitt, and the law firm of Danna McKitrick, P.C. to withdraw from their representation of Mary Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the February 6, 2012 trial date is hereby VACATED. The Court will reset the trial date after the entry of substitute counsel or the expiration of the withdrawal period.( Response to Court due by 2/10/2012.). Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 12/30/2011. (KSM)
February 1, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc.'s motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. [Doc. 57] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Mary Haaf's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 57] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall provide defendant Mary Haaf with a CJA Form 23 Financial Affidavit and a copy of this Order at her address, 601 Mulberry Street, Jefferson City, Missouri, 65101. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 2/1/2012. (KSM)
April 17, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that David R. Bohm, Jeffery R. Schmitt, and the law firm of Danna McKitrick, P.C.s motion to withdraw as counsel is GRANTED. [Doc. 61] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Goodman Distribution, Inc.s motion t o strike Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc.s pleadings, including its answer and counterclaim is GRANTED. [Doc. 59]IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the answer of defendant Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc. and the counterclaim of counter-plaintiff Herb Haaf Heating and Cooling, Inc. are STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Mary Haafs letter to the Court, which the Court construes as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. [Doc. 60]IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that defendant Mary Haaf shall refrain from communicatingwith the Court by sending letters or correspondence. As a pro se party, defendant Mary Haaf shall comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 4/17/12. (JWJ)
August 6, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before August 7, 2012 at 5:00 p.m., plaintiff Goodman Distribution, Inc. shall show cause, in writing, why its claims against defendant Mary A. Haaf should not be dismissed for failing to file pretrial materials as ordered in the Case Management Order. Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2012. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/6/2012. (KSM)
February 13, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Goodman Distirbution, Inc.'s amended motion for default judgment against defendant Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc., is GRANTED. [Doc. 67] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plain tiff Goodman Distribution, Inc.'s motion for default judgment against defendant Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc., is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 66] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Goodman Distribution, Inc. is awarded damages in the amo unt of Sixty-One Thousand Eight Hundred Fifty Dollars ($61,850.00) against defendant Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc.. An appropriate judgment will accompany this memorandum and order. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 2/13/2013. (KSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman Distribution, Inc. v. Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodman Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse B. Rochman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herb Haaf Heating & Cooling, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Haaf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]