Downing v. Dwyer et al

Plaintiff: Veda Mae Downing
Defendant: Charles R. Dwyer, Johnny L. Williams, Steven Long and George Lombardi
Case Number: 4:2010cv01509
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Thomas C. Mummert
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is to file her second amended complaint as set forth above within fourteen (14) days of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. [Doc. 13 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 4/5/11. (KLH)
June 29, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and motion for a hearing are each DENIED. 50 and 51 Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on June 29, 2011. (MCB)
August 25, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [Doc. 2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, file an amended complaint. If plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint, this action will be dismissed. Signed by Honorable Charles A. Shaw on 8/25/10. (KJF)
September 28, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 9/28/2010. (RJD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downing v. Dwyer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veda Mae Downing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R. Dwyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny L. Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lombardi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]