T-Mobile USA, Inc. v. Yoak et al

Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Defendant: Jamie D. Yoak, Gregory Fernandez and Mega Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv02244
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to dismiss Defendant Jamie Yoaks counterclaims is GRANTED. [Doc. #101] re: 101 MOTION to Dismiss :Counterclaim filed by Counter Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/18/11. (JWJ)
March 15, 2012 192 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have ten days from the date of this Order to deposit a bond with the Court, as required by Missouri law. Upon such compliance, the motion for prejudgment attachment shall be granted. Absent such action, the motion shall be denied. Response to Court due by 3/26/2012. Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/15/2012. (KSM)
April 4, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Yoak's motion to quash service and set aside the entry of default is DENIED with respect to the motion to quash service. [Docs. #44, 62, 63] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defend ant Yoak shall have up to and including April 15, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Upon such a filing, the Court will set aside the entry of default. Failure to file such a pleading shall result in the entry of the Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment against Defendant Yoak as requested by Plaintiff. Jamie D. Yoak answer due 4/15/2011. Signed by Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/4/2011. (NCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Mobile USA, Inc. v. Yoak et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Louis F. Bonacorsi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie D. Yoak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Fernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Financial, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]