Stenger et al v. Kellett et al

Plaintiff: Steven V. Stenger, Michael E. O'Mara, Patrick M. Dolan, Sr., Mary Sanders, Vincent Sansone, Jasmina Vajzovic and Keith Walston
Defendant: Richard H. Kellett, Julie R. Jones, Ann Pluemer and Anita T. Yeckel
Intervenor: St. Louis County, Missouri
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv02230
Filed: December 22, 2011
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Terry I. Adelman
 
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2012 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that St. Louis County, Missouris motion to intervene [Doc. #16] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 2/6/12. (KXS)
February 7, 2012 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that St. Louis County Council Member Greg Quinn's Motion to Intervene [Doc. #27] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following restrictions shall apply: (1) the Court will not grant any continuanc es or changes to the Court's Case Management Order; (2) Mr. Quinn must intervene as a voter; (3) Mr. Quinn may not introduce additional evidence; (4) Mr. Quinn may not request any relief from this Court except that a lawful map be drawn by the C ourt or that he receive attorney's fees should he prevail; and (5) Mr. Quinn may not expand the legal or factual issues beyond those in the case, subject to this Court's ruling on matters regarding the admission of political evidence during the trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 2/7/12. (KXS)
February 23, 2012 45 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the current St. Louis County, Missouri Council Districts are declared in violation of the Fourteenth Amendment to the United States Constitution, and Article 1, Section 2 of the Missouri Constitution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the apportionment plan adopted by the Court in this Memorandum which is attached hereto as Exhibit A and B, and is the Plaintiffs' proposed plan be declared to meet all federal and state constitutional requirements. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that said plan of reapportionment govern the election of members of the St. Louis County, Missouri Council beginning with the 2012 election and continuing thereafter until St. Louis County, Missouri Council Districts are reapportion ed in accordance with law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendants in the performance of their duties and functions be governed by and comply with the Court-adopted plan of apportionment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 2/23/12. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KXS) (Main Document 45 replaced on 2/23/2012) (DJO).
April 16, 2012 75 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that St. Louis County, Missouri's Motion to Intervene [Doc. # 64 ] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 4/16/12. (KKS)
April 23, 2012 77 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that [Proposed] Intervenor Broadnaxs Motion to Intervene [Doc. #55] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [Proposed] Intervenor Broadnaxs Motion for New Trial or to Amend the Judgment [Doc. #56] is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Broadnaxs Motion for Oral Argument [Doc. #74] is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 4/23/2012. (KMS)
December 6, 2012 82 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs (Doc. No. 59 ) and Supplement to Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs (Doc. No. 79 ) are GRANTED , in part. The Plaintiffs shall recover from the St. Louis County Board of Election Commissioners and St. Louis County the sum of $104,321.12 (One Hundred Four Thousand Three Hundred Twenty-One Dollars and Twelve Cents) as reasonable attorneys f ees, taxable costs, and non-taxable costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Intervenor Greg Quinn's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees (Doc. No. 76 ) is GRANTED. Intervenor Quinn shall recover from the St. Louis County Board of Election Commissioners and St. Louis County the sum of $6,750.00 (Six Thousand Seven Hundred Fifty Dollars) as reasonable attorney's fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 12/06/2012; (DJO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stenger et al v. Kellett et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven V. Stenger
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. O'Mara
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. Dolan, Sr.
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sanders
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Sansone
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmina Vajzovic
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Walston
Represented By: Jane E. Dueker
Represented By: John C. Grellner
Represented By: Crystal K. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Kellett
Represented By: Amy J. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie R. Jones
Represented By: Amy J. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Pluemer
Represented By: Amy J. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita T. Yeckel
Represented By: Amy J. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: St. Louis County, Missouri
Represented By: Patricia J. Redington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]