Shahid et al v. US Bancorp

Defendant: Florissant Police Department and US Bancorp
Plaintiff: Sharhonda Shahid and Mellve Shahid
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00900
Filed: May 17, 2012
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
 
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss [# 6 ] is denied as moot. Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on 6/21/12. (KJS)
June 25, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs are granted leave to file a corrected copy of their amended complaint or a memorandum in compliance with this Memorandum and Order by no later than June 27, 2012. (Response to Court due by 6/27/2012.) Signed by Honorable Catherine D. Perry on June 25, 2012. (BRP)
August 30, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to strike [# 25 -1] is denied, and the motion for more definite statement [# 25 -2] is granted only to the following extent: plaintiffs shall file an ame nded complaint which complies with this Memorandum and Order and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within 21 days of the date of this Order. In all other respects, the motion for more definite statement is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss [# 21 ] is denied without prejudice as moot. ( Response to Court due by 9/20/2012.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 08/30/2012. (CBL)
February 28, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 45 MOTION for Reconsideration re 44 Docket Text Order (in part) filed by Defendant Florissant, City of. Motion is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on February 28, 2013. (MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shahid et al v. US Bancorp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florissant Police Department
Represented By: William A. Hellmich
Represented By: Blake Daniel Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bancorp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharhonda Shahid
Represented By: Sharhonda T. Shahid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mellve Shahid
Represented By: Sharhonda T. Shahid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]