United States of America v. Peters et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and St Louis County
Defendant: Gerald Peters, Darlene Peters and JP Morgan Chase Bank
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv01395
Filed: August 6, 2012
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2014 110 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ms. Peters shall have up to and including September 2, 2014 to show cause why a supersedeas bond should be set in an amount less than the full amount of the judgment or waived. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED that enforcement of the Order of Sale (Doc. No. 98) is temporarily STAYED pending the Courts ruling on Ms. Peters' motion for a stay. (Doc. No. 106.) Show Cause Response due by 9/2/2014. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/22/2014. (NCL)
October 23, 2013 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before November 4, 2013, Defendant Darlene Peters shall either file with the Court or provide to appointed counsel a signed copy of the engagement letter and Limited Representation Appearance for m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant fails to timely file or provide to counsel the necessary signed documents, the Court will terminate Ms. Cohens appointment in this matter. Thereafter, Ms. Peters will proceed pro se for all purposes, inc luding ADR, until such time, if ever, as she retains counsel. Defendant is again reminded that as a pro se litigant, she is required to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules and practices of this Court. See United St ates v. Green, 691 F.3d 960, 965-66 (8th Cir. 2012) (holding that the right of self- representation is not a license not to comply with relevant rules of procedural and substantive law) (quoting Faretta v. California, 422 U.S. 806, 834 n. 46 (1975)).. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/23/2013. (RAK)
December 23, 2013 56 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Darlene Peters motion to reconvene mediation in this matter is GRANTED, with the condition that the conference be limited to one half day. Each party shall bear its own costs with respe ct to this additional session. (Doc. No. 54.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the ADR referral in this matter is extended through Friday, January17, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Government is granted leave to participate by telephone in the additional mediation session. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ms. Peters shall make full disclosure of any interests she has in any trusts not later than Monday, December 30, 2013. Further, to the extent she seeks to settle the claims based on an inability to pay, Ms. Peters shall submit, not later than ten (10) days prior to the mediation conference, a signed Form 433-A. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the deadline for the filing of summary judgment motions in this matter is extended to Friday, January 31, 2014. (Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2014.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/23/2013. (NCL)
May 12, 2014 83 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Mr. Harry Charles, counsel for Defendant Gerald Peters, to withdraw from this action is GRANTED, for the reasons set forth in the motion. (Doc. No. 76.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Peters is granted ten days, through Thursday, May 22, 2014, to obtain substitute counsel. ( Response to Court due by 5/22/2014.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/12/14. (JWJ)
June 11, 2014 90 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 59.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Darlene Peters' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. (Doc. No. 66.) IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that on or before June 20, 2014, the United States shall file for entry by the Court a proposed Order of Sale enforcing the judgment in this matter against the Ailanthus Property. A separate judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. (Response to Court due by 6/20/2014.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/11/2014. (NCL)
July 21, 2014 96 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Gerald Peters' "Response to Memorandum and Order of 5/27/2014" is DENIED. (Doc. No. 92.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/21/2014. (NCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Peters et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Miranda J. Bureau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Louis County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Peters
Represented By: Harry Charles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]