Nielsen v. Union Security Insurance Company

Defendant: Union Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Christina Nielsen
Case Number: 4:2012cv01698
Filed: September 19, 2012
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 26 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED pursuant to this Court's Order of June 25, 2013 (Doc. No. 32) that all discovery in this matter shall be completed within thirty (30) days from the date of this order and no later than August 23, 2013.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/24/13. (LGK)
November 13, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Determine the Applicable Standard of Review and Scope of the Administrative Record 36 is GRANTED in part. The Court will reopen the administrative record to include Plain tiffs Letter of Appeal and exhibits attached thereto. (Doc. Nos. 37-1-13) The Court will defer consideration of the standard of review until after the parties have completed their summary judgment briefing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED on the Courts own motion that the dispositive motion deadline of November 29, 2013, be extended for an additional fourteen (14) days, up to and including Friday, December 13, 2013.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/13/13. (LGK)
December 18, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Union Security Insurance Company's Motion to Stay Proceedings for Administrative Review 44 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for attorneys fees is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for filing dispositive motions is extended to January 10, 2014. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/18/13. (ARL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielsen v. Union Security Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Security Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Nielsen
Represented By: Talia Ravis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]