Hayden v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Mary Hayden
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2012cv02030
Filed: November 1, 2012
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: David D. Noce
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of defendant United States of America to dismiss plaintiff's lost chance of survival claim (Doc. 6 .) is sustained. This claim is dismissed without prejudice. The action will proceed on plaintiff's wrongful death claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendant United States of America to strike plaintiff Mary Haydens demand for a jury trial (Doc. 8 ) is sustained. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/19/13. (KJS)
June 19, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the defendant United States of America to dismiss plaintiff's Count II claim for lost chance of survival (Doc. 34) is sustained. The claim is dismissed without prejudice to plaintiff amending the complaint in this regard. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 6/19/2013. (KMS)
September 19, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiff Mary Hayden for a more definite statement (Doc. 48 ) is denied.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 9/19/13. (KKS)
February 11, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM : An appropriate Judgment Order is issued herewith.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 2/11/14. (KKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Hayden
Represented By: Thomas K. Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]