Hodge v. United States of America

Respondent: United States of America
Petitioner: Bradley Hodge
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv02191
Filed: November 19, 2012
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
 
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Coram Nobis
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on April 25, 2013. (BRP)
May 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's second motion for reconsideration of this Court's dismissal of his application for writ of audita querela [ECF No. 18 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that the Court declines to issue petitioner a Certificate of Appealability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner will not be allowed to file any additional pleadings in this closed case unless said pleadings relate directly to an Appeal. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 05/30/2013. (CBL)
March 21, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's application for a writ of audita querela and/or for writ of error coram nobis [ECF No. 1 ]is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's motion to dismiss [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. A separate Judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/21/2013. (CBL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hodge v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Jeannette Graviss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bradley Hodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]