Flores v. Bank of America, BAC, Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy Flores
Defendant: Key Mortgage Service, LLC, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and Bank of America, BAC, Corp.
Case Number: 4:2012cv02201
Filed: November 27, 2012
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the temporary restraining order in this matter is extended until December 14, 2012. Defendant Bank of America is prohibited from proceeding with any foreclosure action, absent further order of this Cou rt, on Plaintiff Dorothy Flores' real property located at 209 St. Charles Street, Wentzville, Missouri, 63385. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a preliminary injunction hearing is set in this matter on December 13, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16 South.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/30/12. (LGK)
December 11, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to continue the preliminary injunction hearing # 20 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary injunction hearing is reset and will now be held on January 3, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 16 South. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the temporary restraining order in this matter is extended until the preliminary injunction hearing or further order of this Court. Defendant Bank of America is prohibited from proceeding with any foreclosure action, absent further order of this Court, on Plaintiff Dorothy Flores real property located at 209 St. Charles Street, Wentzville, Missouri, 63385. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/11/12. (ARL)
November 27, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -......IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a temporary restraining order is entered in this matter. Defendant Bank of America is prohibited from proceeding with any foreclosure action absent further order of this Court on Plaintif f Dorothy Flores' real property located at 209 St. Charles Street, Wentzville, Missouri, 63385. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall post a bond of $100.00 to effect this temporary restraining order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED< /B> that a preliminary injunction hearing is set in this matter on November 30, 2012 at 12:00 pm in Courtroom 16 South. In Court Hearing-Preliminary Injunction set for 11/30/2012 12:00 PM in Courtroom 16S before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel.). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/27/2012. @1:39pm November 27, 2012 (MRC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Bank of America, BAC, Corp. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Flores
Represented By: Jane C. Hogan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Mortgage Service, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Abel
Represented By: Rhiana A. Luaders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, BAC, Corp.
Represented By: Kevin M. Abel
Represented By: Rhiana A. Luaders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]