Mallory v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Keith Mallory
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00363
Filed: February 26, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Referring Judge: Terry I. Adelman
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2013 17 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than November 27, 2013, Plaintiff shall either file a brief in support of his Complaint or a pleading stating that he intends to pursue his claims based solely on the allegations set forth in his Complaint. In the event Plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims by way of a separate Brief in Support of Complaint, Plaintiff shall set forth therein the specific bases upon which he claims the Commissioner to have erred in the determination to de ny him benefits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the undersigned will recommend the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Orders of the Court. ( Social Security Brief due by 11/27/2013.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 11/6/13. (KJS)
November 27, 2013 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than December 27, 2013, Defendant shall file a brief in support of the Answer. ( Social Security Cross Brief due by 12/27/2013.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 11/27/13. (KKS)
March 3, 2014 24 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge Adelman 23 is SUSTAINED, ADOPTED AND INCORPORATED herein. The Commissioner's decision denying social security benefits is AFFIRMED. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/3/14. (LGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mallory v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Mallory
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]