Meriwether v. Beverly Hills Grocery and Liquor et al

Defendant: Mike Sabbar, Tim Sabbar and Beverly Hills Grocery and Liquor
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Meriwether
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00424
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss [# 16 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file her first amended complaint [# 24 ] is granted. The complaint is deemed filed as of today. Defendants shall file an answer no later than November 11, 2013. This case will be set for a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by separate order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on October 23, 2013. (BRP)
April 29, 2013 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Mary Ellen Meriwether. Motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall show cause within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order as to why the Court should not dismiss her Title VII claims as time-barred. ( Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2013.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on April 29, 2013. (MCB)
May 29, 2013 7 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to be issued upon the complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 29, 2013. (BRP)
May 29, 2013 8 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. # 4 ] is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on May 29, 2013. (BRP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meriwether v. Beverly Hills Grocery and Liquor et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Sabbar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sabbar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Hills Grocery and Liquor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ellen Meriwether
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]