Strahan v. St. Louis County Justice Center

Defendant: St. Louis County Justice Center, Edward Bernsen and Unknown Rottenk
Plaintiff: George Strahan
Case Number: 4:2013cv00448
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Frederick R. Buckles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue as to defendant Fred Rottnek, who is alleged to be a doctor at the St. Louis County Justice Center. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against St. Louis County Justice Center are DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/12/13. (CSG)
March 15, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's fo rm Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that his amended co mplaint will take the place of his original complaint and will be the only pleading that this Court will review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $350 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis wit hin thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also submit a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period immediately pr eceding the filing of his complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. If the case is dismissed for noncompliance with this Order, the dismissal will not constitute a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 3/15/2013. (NCL) Modified docket text on 3/15/2013 (NCL).
April 11, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall send plaintiff a Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely submit a second amended complaint, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Frederick R. Buckles on 4/11/2013. (NCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strahan v. St. Louis County Justice Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis County Justice Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bernsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rottenk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Strahan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]