Clemons v. Lombardi et al

Plaintiff: Reginald Clemons
Defendant: George A. Lombardi, John/Jane Doe, Jeff Harper, Timothy Lancaster, Troy Steele, Thomas Collins, Daniel Dicus, Brenda Ross, Christine Henson and Douglas Nickelson
Case Number: 4:2013cv00458
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted as to plaintiff's First Amendment access-to-the-court claims, to plaintiff' s Sixth Amendment claims, and to plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims. The motion is denied as to plaintiff's retaliation claim involving Thomas Collins, Jeff Harper, and Daniel Dicus. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants George Lombardi, John/Jane Doe (General Counsel), Troy Steele, Brenda Ross, Douglas Nickleson, Timothy Lancaster, John/Jane Doe (Functional Unit Manager), and Christine Henson are DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on July 10, 2013. (BRP)
November 13, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's Order dated October 22, 2013, [ECF No. 36 ] is partially VACATED, as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the amended complaint [ECF No. 37 ] is STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any amended pleading must be filed no later than December 2, 2013. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/2/2013.) Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 13, 2013. (BRP)
March 19, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $59.81 within thi rty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against the defendants in their official capacities are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 03/19/2013. (CBL)
February 3, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel and for sanctions [# 46 ] is granted only to the extent that if defendants have not yet responded as they represented in their briefs, they mu st do so within seven days; the motion is denied in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel discovery by inspections [# 48 ] and his motion to compel production of documents [# 49 ] are denied. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time [# 55 ] to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted, and plaintiff must file any brief in opposition to that motion no later than Wednesday, March 5, 2014. Defendants must file any reply brief within fourteen days after receipt of plaintiff's brief. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 02/03/2014. (CBL)
June 4, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendants' motion for summary judgment [# 52 ] is granted. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 06/04/2014. (CBL)
June 20, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within thirty days of the date of this Order, either pay the $505 appellate filing fee1 or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with a certified copy of his pri soner account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the notice of appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the "Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Prisoner Cases" form. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on June 20, 2014. (MCB)(Memorandum and Order and court provided form sent to Plaintiff this date.)
July 15, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $58 within thirty (30) days of the date of t his Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on July 15, 2014. (BRP)
April 22, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for permanent injunction and for a temporary restraining order [ECF No. 7 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/22/2013. (CBL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. Lombardi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Clemons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Lombardi
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Harper
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Lancaster
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Steele
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Collins
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dicus
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Ross
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Henson
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Nickelson
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]