Box v. Kemna

Respondent: Mike Kemna
Petitioner: Keith D. Box
Case Number: 4:2013cv00540
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration [#6] is denied. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/18/13. (LAH)
June 27, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to compel # 16 and motion for certificate of appealability # 17 are denied. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/27/13. (ARL)
June 28, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to compel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners motion for certificate ofappealability is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent petitioner's motions could be construed as a second motion for reconsideration of the dismissal of this action, his motions are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/28/13. (ARL)
March 21, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall administratively terminate petitioner's "motion for Rule 60(b) review" in case 4:98-CV-0801-RWS and open petitioner's motion as a new civil action under 28 U.S.C. 2254.Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on March 21, 2013. (WAF)
April 10, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's application for writ of habeas corpus, styled as a "Motion for Rule 60(b) Review" is DENIED and DISMISSED.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/10/13. (LGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Box v. Kemna
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Kemna
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith D. Box
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]