Patterson v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Norval William Patterson, III
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00551
Filed: March 22, 2013
 
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than May 27, 2014, Plaintiff shall either file a brief in support of his Complaint or a pleading stating that he intends to pursue his claims based solely on the allegations set forth in his Complaint. In the event Plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims by way of a separate Brief in Support of Complaint, Plaintiff shall set forth therein the specific bases upon which he claims the Commissioner to have erred in the determination to deny hi m benefits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the undersigned may recommend the case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Orders of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 4/30/14. (KJS)
May 28, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than June 30, 2014, Defendant shall file a brief in support of the Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 5/28/14. (KJS)
August 1, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge is SUSTAINED, ADOPTED, and INCORPORATED herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner denying Plaintiff's application for disability insurance benefits under Title II of the Social Security Act is AFFIRMED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 08/01/2014. (NEB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patterson v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norval William Patterson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]